No. 20-5344
Title:Christopher Taylor, Petitioner
v.
Illinois
Docketed:August 13, 2020
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, First District
   Case Numbers:(1-15-0628)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 27, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 14, 2020)
Petition
Sep 08 2020Waiver of right of respondent People Of The State Of Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Oct 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.
Dec 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 7, 2021.
Jan 07 2021Brief of respondent Illinois in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Reply of petitioner Christopher Taylor filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael C. Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Office of the State Appellate Defender
203 N. LaSalle St.
24th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

michael.bennett@osad.state.il.us
3128145472
Party name: Christopher Taylor
Douglas Robert HoffOffice of the State Appellate Defender
203 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60601

douglas.hoff@osad.state.il.us
3128145472
Party name: Christopher Taylor
Attorneys for Respondent
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: Illinois
Michael Marc GlickIllinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: People Of The State Of Illinois