No. 20-534
Vide 20-536
Title:All Saints' Episcopal Church (Fort Worth), Petitioner
v.
The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
Docketed:October 22, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(18-0438)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Nov 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of Greek Orthodox Archdiocese of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Amicus brief of The Rutherford Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Amicus brief of General Assembly of the Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.), General Synod of the Reformed Church in America, General Council on Finance and Administration of the United Methodist Church, Moravian Church in America, General Synod of the United Church of Christ submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: All Saints' Episcopal Church (Fort Worth)
Attorneys for Respondents
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
Other
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: General Assembly of the Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.), General Synod of the Reformed Church in America, General Council on Finance and Administration of the United Methodist Church, Moravian Church in America, General Synod of the United Church of Christ
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
John Socratis Zavitsanos
    Counsel of Record
Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.
1221 McKinney Street
Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77010

jzavitsanos@azalaw.com
713.600.4901
Party name: Greek Orthodox Archdiocese of America