No. 20-5279
Title:William Dale Wooden, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5189)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 4, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Aug 12 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 22 2020Response Requested. (Due October 22, 2020)
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020.
Nov 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Dec 21 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2021Reply of petitioner William Dale Wooden filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. Petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029426234
Party name: William Dale Wooden
William Dale Wooden48306-074
P.O. Box 9000
Forrest City, AR 72336

Party name: William Dale Wooden
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States