No. 20-520
Vide 20-512
Title:American Athletic Conference, et al., Petitioners
v.
Shawne Alston, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15566, 19-15662)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Brief of respondents Shawne Alston, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner The Big Ten Conference, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-512 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 16 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-512. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-512. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 31, 2021. VIDED.
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 04 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. Part of the record is SEALED and has been electronically filed.
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Mar 31 2021Argued. For petitioners: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Kessler, New York, N. Y.; and Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steve W. Berman
    Counsel of Record
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98101

steve@hbsslaw.com
206-623-7292
Party name: Shawne Alston, et al.
Other
Jay L. Himes
    Counsel of Record
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
140 Broadway
New York, NY 10005

jhimes@labaton.com
212-907-0834
Party name: Open Markets Institute
Robert Samuel Kitchenoff
    Counsel of Record
Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC
150 Monument Road, Suite 107
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

kitchenoff@wka-law.com
2155457200
Party name: The Committee to Support the Antitrust Laws
Anita M. Moorman
    Counsel of Record
Sport Administration Program, Univ. of Louisville
SAC East, Suite 104R
Louisville, KY 40292

amm@louisville.edu
5028520553
Party name: Sam C. Ehrlich
Bruce Davidson Oakley
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
609 Main Street
Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002-2781

Bruce.Oakley@hoganlovells.com
(713) 632-1420
Party name: Antitrust Economists
Jack Edward Pace III
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jpace@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8200
Party name: Antitrust Law And Business School Professors
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-458-3409
Party name: American Athletic Conference, et al.