No. 20-518
Title:Darrius Marcel Mastin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14241)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2020 to December 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 21, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Darrius Mastin
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States