No. 20-512
Vide 20-520
Title:National Collegiate Athletic Association, Petitioner
v.
Shawne Alston, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2020
Linked with 20A145
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15566, 19-15662)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief of respondents Shawne Alston, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner National Collegiate Athletic Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-520 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 16 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-512. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-512. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 21 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners National Collegiate Athletic Association. VIDED.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, National Collegiate Athletic Association
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Shawne Alston, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 31, 2021. VIDED.
Feb 01 2021Brief of petitioner National Collegiate Athletic Association filed (in 20-512).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief of petitioners American Athletic Conference, et al. filed (in 20-520).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 04 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. Part of the record is SEALED and has been electronically filed.
Feb 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Federation Of State High School Associations filed (in 20-512).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education and Ten Other Higher Education Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas B. Nachbar filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Student-Athletes filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Application (20A145) to extend the time to file the reply briefs on the merits from 2 p.m., March 19, 2021 to 2 p.m., March 21, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan. VIDED.
Main Document
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Feb 24 2021Application (20A145) denied by Justice Kagan. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-8768
Party name: Shawne Alston, et al.
Other
Jay L. Himes
    Counsel of Record
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
140 Broadway
New York, NY 10005

jhimes@labaton.com
212-907-0834
Party name: Open Markets Institute
Thomas Benjamin Nachbar
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

tnachbar@law.virginia.edu
4349247588
Party name: Thomas B. Nachbar
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Former Student-Athletes
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: American Council on Education and Ten Other Higher Education Associations
Anita M. Moorman
    Counsel of Record
Sport Administration Program, Univ. of Louisville
SAC East, Suite 104R
Louisville, KY 40292

amm@louisville.edu
5028520553
Party name: Sam C. Ehrlich
Bruce Davidson Oakley
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
609 Main Street
Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002-2781

Bruce.Oakley@hoganlovells.com
(713) 632-1420
Party name: Antitrust Economists
Jack Edward Pace III
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jpace@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8200
Party name: Antitrust Law And Business School Professors
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-458-3409
Party name: Georgia, et al.
Yen-Shyang Tseng
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave.
8th Fl.
Burbank, CA 91505

ytseng@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: National Federation Of State High School Associations