No. 20-510
Title:IQVIA Inc., Petitioner
v.
Florence Mussat, M.D., S.C.
Docketed:October 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1204)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, IQVIA Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 03 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Florence Mussat, M.D. S.C.
Blanket Consent
Nov 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020.
Nov 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: IQVIA Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Florence Mussat, M.D. S.C.
Curtis Charles Warner5 E. Market Street, Suite 250
Corning, NY 14830

cwarner@warnerlawllc.com
8885518685
Party name: Florence Mussat, M.D. S.C.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
202.588.0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5100
Party name: DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar
John Mark Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett PLLC
2723 South State Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

jthomas@dykema.com
734-214-7613
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.