No. 20-507 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tony Mays, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Anthony Darrell Dugard Hines
Docketed:October 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-5384)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to January 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2021.
Jan 15 2021Brief of respondent Anthony Darrell Dugard Hines in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Anthony Darrell Dugard Hines.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2021Reply of petitioner Tony Mays, Warden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021Proof of Service filed with respect to reply brief of petitioner.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 05 2021Record Requested.
Feb 26 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the Sixth Circuit (3 boxes of state court records).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Henry Bledsoe III
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P. O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

John.Bledsoe@ag.tn.gov
6157414351
Party name: Tony Mays, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
James Othel Martin III
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender - Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

Jay_Martin@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Anthony Darrell Dugard Hines