No. 20-5
Title:Richard Blumenthal, et al., Petitioners
v.
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Docketed:July 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5237)
   Decision Date:February 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2020 to September 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 9, 2020.
Aug 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Niskanen Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Harold H. Bruff, Peter M. Shane, Peter L. Strauss, and Paul R. Verkuil filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Standing, Federal Jurisdiction, and Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Richard Blumenthal, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, Donald
Other
Benjamin Seth Feuer
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

ben.feuer@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: Bipartisan Former Members of Congress
Steven Eliott Fineman
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor
New York, NY 10013

sfineman@lchb.com
(212) 355-9500
Party name: Scholars of Standing, Federal Jurisdiction, and Constitutional Law
Erica Courtney Lai
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
2001 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

elai@cohengresser.com
(202) 851-2073
Party name: Legal Historians
Katharine Minkel Mapes
    Counsel of Record
Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP
1875 Eye Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

Katharine.mapes@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: Harold H. Bruff, Peter M. Shane, Peter L. Strauss, and Paul R. Verkuil
Michael Patrick Yingling
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
10 South Wacker Dr., 40th Fl.
Chicago, IL 60606

mpyingling@reedsmith.com
312-207-2834
Party name: The Niskanen Center