No. 20-499
Title:Nathaniel Richard Hull, Petitioner
v.
Jeffrey J. Rockwell
Docketed:October 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2074)
   Decision Date:July 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to January 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: Nathaniel Richard Hull
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Jeffrey J. Rockwell