No. 20-495
Title:Charee Stanley, Petitioner
v.
ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.
Docketed:October 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1034)
   Decision Date:April 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent Express Airlines, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Charee Stanley
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Pierce WimberlyFord & Harrison LLP
271 17th Street, N.W., Suite 1900
Atanta, GA 30363

404-888-3842
Party name: Express Airlines, Inc.