No. 20-490
Title:Damien Freeman, Petitioner
v.
Lyneal Wainwright, Warden
Docketed:October 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3913)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Brief of respondent Lyneal Wainwright in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 24, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until December 9, 2020 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Damien Freeman
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Lyneal Wainwright