No. 20-489
Title:Pedro M. Bess, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0086)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 10 2020Motion of United States for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (November 13, 2020 - corrected letter to be submitted)
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020.
Nov 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2020 to February 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2021.
Feb 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to March 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 18, 2021.
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Apr 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 19, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifton Earl Morgan III
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Navy JAG Corps
1254 Charles Morris St, SE, Bldg.58, Suite 100
Washington, DC 20374

clifton.morgan@navy.mil
202-685-7052
Party name: Pedro Bess
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States