No. 20-486
Title:Nathaniel Ogle, Petitioner
v.
Ohio Civil Service Employees Association, AFSCME Local 11, AFL-CIO
Docketed:October 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3701)
   Decision Date:March 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ohio Civil Service Employees Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 12 2020Response Requested. (Due December 14, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Nathaniel Ogle
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Francis Griffin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rgriffin@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Ohio Civil Service Employees Association