No. 20-481
Title:GE Capital Retail Bank, Petitioner
v.
Nyree Belton
Docketed:October 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-648)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Brief of respondents Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A. in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent Nyree Belton; Kimberly Bruce to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: GE Capital Retail Bank
Attorneys for Respondent
George Fortune Carpinello
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207

gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
(518) 434-0600
Party name: Nyree Belton; Kimberly Bruce
Joseph Robert Guerra
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jguerra@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A.