No. 20-480
Title:David Bryon Babcock, Petitioner
v.
Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:October 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1687)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.
Dec 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Dec 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 13, 2021.
Jan 13 2021Brief of respondent Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 27 2021Reply of petitioner David Babcock filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition GRANTED.
Mar 01 2021As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Mar 12 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 20, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 26, 2021.
May 14 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner David Babcock.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2021Brief of petitioner David Babcock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar KatyalHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: David Babcock
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Saul, Acting Comm'r of SSA
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program, Reserve Organization of America, and Enlisted Association of the National Guard of the United States