No. 20-478
Title:CBX Resources, L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
ACE American Insurance Company, et al.
Docketed:October 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50740)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Waiver of right of respondent ACE American Insurance Company, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 10 2020Response Requested. (Due December 10, 2020)
Nov 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2020 to January 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 11, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Anthony John Fassold
    Counsel of Record
Watts Guerra, LLP
4 Dominion Drive
Bldg. 3, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78257

mfassold@wattsguerra.com
210-447-0500
Party name: CBX Resources, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan D. Hacker
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jhacker@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: ACE American Insurance Company, et al.