No. 20-47
Title:Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Gretchen Whitmer, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2199, 18-2200)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2020Waiver of right of respondents Governor Gretchen Whitmer, Attorney General Dana Nessel, and MLCC Chairperson Pat Gagliard to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 18 2020Brief amici curiae of 23 Wine Consumers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Wine Retailers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2020Response Requested. (Due October 9, 2020)
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Sep 17 2020Motion of respondent Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Motion of respondent Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Alexander Tanford
    Counsel of Record
Epstein Cohen Seif & Porter LLP
50 S. Meridian St.
Suite 505
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tanford@indiana.edu
812-332-4966
Party name: Lebamoff Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Governor Gretchen Whitmer, Attorney General Dana Nessel, and MLCC Chairperson Pat Gagliard
Deborah A. Skakel
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

dskakel@blankrome.com
2128855511
Party name: Michigan Beer & Wine Wholesalers Association
Other
Sean M. O'Leary
    Counsel of Record
O'Leary Law and Policy Group, LLC
200 w. Madison, Ste 2100
Chicago, IL 60606

sean.o@irishliquorlawyer.com
312 535-8380
Party name: National Association of Wine Retailers
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

jgtatty@yahoo.com
5024129179
Party name: 23 Wine Consumers