No. 20-464
Title:James J. Rosemond, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3561)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Evan Rayfield
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

mrayfield@mayerbrown.com
212-506-2560
Party name: James Rosemond
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States