No. 20-46
Title:Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Petitioner
v.
Sherwin Alumina Company, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40557)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 31 2020Waiver of right of respondent Sherwin Alumina Company, LLC and Sherwin Pipeline, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark G. Arnold
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell Sanders LLP
190 Carondelet Plaza
Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63105-3441

mark.arnold@huschblackwell.com
314-480-1802
Party name: Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Sherwin Alumina Company, LLC and Sherwin Pipeline, Inc.