No. 20-457
Title:MarketGraphics Research Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
David Peter Berge
Docketed:October 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6177)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: MarketGraphics Research Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: David Peter Berge