No. 20-450
Title:Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:October 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3169)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 12, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2020.
Nov 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2020 to January 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 27 2020Motion to further extend the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari DENIED.
Dec 09 2020Brief of respondent Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
(312) 853-7875
Party name: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.
David Ernest Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

david.morrison@goldbergkohn.com
312-201-4000
Party name: Cook County, Illinois