No. 20-449
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:October 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3591, 19-3595)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2020)
Proof of ServicePetition
Oct 23 2020Motion of Make the Road New York, et al. to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2020Motion State of New York, et al. to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Homeland Secuirty, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

jhurwitz@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3254
Party name: Make the Road New York, African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), and Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, and Vermont; and City of New York