No. 20-443
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev
Docketed:October 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-6001)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev