No. 20-440
Title:Minerva Surgical, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Hologic, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2054, 2019-2081)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Minerva Surgical, Inc.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Brief of respondents Hologic, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner Minerva Surgical, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Minerva Surgical, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix volumes 1 and 2 with supplemental appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Minerva Surgical, Inc.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed in support of neither party.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed in support of neither party.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York City Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 21, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondents Hologic, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of United Therapeutics Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Leading Technology Composites, Inc. and Clarkwestern Dietrich Building Systems LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 07 2021Reply of petitioner Minerva Surgical, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2021Argued. For petitioner: Robert N. Hochman, Chicago, Ill. For United States, as amicus curiae: Morgan L. Ratner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Matthew M. Wolf, Washington, D. C.
Jun 29 2021Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Barrett, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Gorsuch, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
(312) 853-2936
Party name: Minerva Surgical, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew McManus Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

matthew.wolf@arnoldporter.com
2029425462
Party name: Hologic, Inc., et al.
Other
Christopher Theodore Bavitz
    Counsel of Record
Cyberlaw Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts, Ave, Suite WCC 5018
Cambridge, MA 02138

cbavitz@law.harvard.edu
6174965155
Party name: Engine Advocacy
Robert M. Isackson
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LLP
One Barker Avenue
Fifth Floor
White Plains, NY 10601

isackson@leasonellis.com
914-821-1618
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@durietangri.com
650-723-4605
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors
Richard Thomas Matthews
    Counsel of Record
Williams Mullen
301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700
Raleigh, NC 27601

rmatthews@williamsmullen.com
919-981-4000
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Charles Luther McCloud
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

lmccloud@wc.com
202-434-5586
Party name: United Therapeutics Corp.
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dortiz@law.virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Leading Technology Composites, Inc. and Clarkwestern Dietrich Building Systems LLC
Aaron Ligoury Joseph Pereira
    Counsel of Record
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
2001 Market Street
Suite #2800
Philadelphia, NJ 19103

apereira@panitchlaw.com
2159651348
Party name: New York City Bar Association
Elizabeth B. PrelogarActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9100
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association.
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thomas.saunders@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6536
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America