No. 20-439 | |
Title: | Mantissa Corporation, Petitioner v. Ondot Systems, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | October 6, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-2533) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 4, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. |
Dec 07 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Anthony John Demarco Counsel of Record | Young Basile Hanlon & MacFarlane, P.C. 700 Milam St. Suite 1300 Houston, TX 77002 demarco@youngbasile.com | 2482440106 |
Party name: Mantissa Corporation |