No. 20-437
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Refugio Palomar-Santiago
Docketed:October 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10011)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2020.
Dec 07 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Refugio Palomar-Santiago.
Main Document
Dec 07 2020Brief of respondent Refugio Palomar-Santiago in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jan 22 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 26 2021Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Refugio Palomar-Santiago.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED, and Bradley N. Garcia, Esq., of Washington, D.C., is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent in this case.
Feb 22 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 27, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 15 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent Refugio Palomar-Santiago filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Immigration Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Kelly Lytle Hernández, Mae Ngai, and Ingrid Eagly filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Bradley N. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bgarcia@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Refugio Palomar-Santiago
Jeffrey L. FisherO'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025-7019

jlfisher@omm.com
650-473-2633
Party name: Refugio Palomar-Santiago
Aarin KevorkianFederal Public Defender
411 E. Bonneville Ave. Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101

Aarin_Kevorkian@fd.org
7023886577
Party name: Refugio Palomar-Santiago
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Alexia D Korberg
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
12285 Avenue of Americas
New York, NY 10019

akorberg@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Professors Kelly Lytle Hernández, Mae Ngai, and Ingrid Eagly
Tobias Samuel Loss-Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tlosseaton@sidley.com
2027368427
Party name: The National Immigration Project, The Immigrant Defense Project, and The National Immigrant Justice Center
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3818
Party name: Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges
Brianna Fuller Mircheff
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
321 E. 2nd Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

Brianna_Mircheff@fd.org
2138944784
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers