No. 20-426
Title:William L. Huntress, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:October 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1147)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: William Huntress, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America