No. 20-422
Title:Sarah R. Lee, Petitioner
v.
Ohio Education Association, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3250)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ohio Education Association, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 10 2020Response Requested. (Due December 10, 2020)
Dec 10 2020Brief of respondents Ohio Education Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 14 2021Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Sarah Lee
Attorneys for Respondents
Jacob Raffel Karabell
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jkarabell@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: Ohio Education Association, et al.