No. 20-421 | |
Title: | Progressive Lawn Managers, Inc., Petitioner v. Lawn Managers, Inc. |
Docketed: | October 1, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-2658) |
Decision Date: | May 20, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 29, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 28 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 15 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Lawn Managers, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 21 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020. |
Nov 09 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Don V. Kelly Counsel of Record | Evans & Dixon, LLC 211 N. Broadway Suite 2500 Saint Louis, MO 63102 dkelly@evans-dixon.com | 314-552-4066 |
Party name: Progressive Lawn Managers, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Susan Nell Rowe Counsel of Record | Rowe Law Office, LLC 2117 Nebraska Avenue St. Louis, MO 63104 snrowe@snrowelaw.com | 314-852-8291 |
Party name: Lawn Managers, Inc. |