No. 20-405
Title:City of Miami Gardens, Florida, Petitioner
v.
Wells Fargo & Co., et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-13152)
   Decision Date:July 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2020 to November 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: City of Miami Gardens
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Wells Fargo & Co., et al.