No. 20-402
Title:Chad Richardson, et ux., Individually and as Parents and Next Friends of L, Petitioners
v.
Omaha School District
Docketed:September 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2058)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondent Omaha School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner Chad and Tonya Richardson, Individually and as Parents and Next Friends of L filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Chad and Tonya Richardson, Individually and as Parents and Next Friends of L
Attorneys for Respondent
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7726
Party name: Omaha School District