No. 20-400
Title:James Avery, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14430)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Oct 22 2020Response Requested. (Due November 23, 2020)
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: James Avery, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States