No. 20-391
Title:Jody Lombardo, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al.
Docketed:September 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1469)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Brief amici curiae of Policing Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Brief of respondents City of St. Louis, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Brief amici curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 12 2020Reply of petitioners Jody Lombardo, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 07 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 04 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 11 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 19 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 16 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 22 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 01 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 15 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 23 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 29 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 12 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 21 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 29 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners Jody Lombardo, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 12 2021Record Requested.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 20 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit (1 box).
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 01 2021Record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Missouri (1 envelope).
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Ellis Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

jon@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Jody Lombardo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert H. Dierker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
City Counselor
314 City Hall
1200 Market St.
St. Louis, MO 63103

dierkerr@stlouis-mo.gov
3146223361
Party name: City of St. Louis, et al.
Other
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and The American Civil Liberties Union
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Policing Scholars
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc. and the Rutherford Institute