No. 20-382
Title:Territory of Guam, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5131)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 26, 2020 to November 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2020.
Nov 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2020.
Dec 07 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner Government of Guam filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Government of Guam filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of ConservAmerica filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Territories of The Commonwealth Of The Northern Mariana Islands, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 26, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 16 2021The record received from the U.S. District and Bankruptcy Courts is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 16 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. is electronic and located on Pacer. The oral argument transcript, has been electronically received and filed.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Richfield Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Government of Guam
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Joseph S. Diedrich
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
33 E. Main Street, Suite 300
Madison, WI 53703

joseph.diedrich@huschblackwell.com
608-255-4440
Party name: Territories of The Commonwealth Of The Northern Mariana Islands, et al.
John A. Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Earth & Water Law, LLC
1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20001

john.sheehan@earthandwatergroup.com
3019805032
Party name: ConservAmerica
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP
1550 Seventeenth Street
Suite 500
Denver, CO 80202

shannon.stevenson@dgslaw.com
303-892-9400
Party name: Atlantic Richfield Company