No. 20-381
Title:Hamilton County Job and Family Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph Siefert, et ux.
Docketed:September 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4179)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief of Joseph Siefert, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jon David Brittingham
    Counsel of Record
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
255 E. Fifth Street
Suite 1900
Cincinnati, OH 45202-4797

david.brittingham@dinsmore.com
513-977-8455
Party name: Hamilton County Job and Family Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ted Laurence Wills
    Counsel of Record
Ted L. Wills, Attomey at Law
102 East Fourth Street, Suite 304
Cincinnati, OH 45202

TedLWills@aol.com
5137215707
Party name: Joseph Siefert, et al.