No. 20-380
Title:Idenix Pharmaceuticals LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Docketed:September 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1691)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2020Waiver of right of respondent Gilead Sciences, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 16 2020Response Requested. (Due November 16, 2020)
Oct 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020.
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Amgen Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Idenix Pharmaceuticals LLC and Universita Degli Studi di Cagliari
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Other
John M. Desmarais
    Counsel of Record
Desmarais LLP
230 Park Avenue
Floor 26
New York, NY 10169

jdesmarais@desmaraisllp.com
212-351-3400
Party name: GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC.
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Amgen Inc.
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@law.stanford.edu
650-723-4605
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors