No. 20-38
Vide 20-37
Title:Arkansas, Petitioner
v.
Charles Gresham, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5094, 19-5096)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondents Charles Gresham, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 04 2020Reply of petitioner State of Arkansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 04 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-37 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 04 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-37. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-37. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 29, 2021. VIDED.
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit.
Feb 08 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 08 2021Record from the U.S. District and Bankruptcy Courts are electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Feb 23 2021Amicus brief of Nebraska Appleseed not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2021--to be filed in lead case No. 20-37)
Feb 25 2021Amicus brief of Leukemia & Lymphoma Society not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2021--to be filed in lead case No. 20-37)
Mar 11 2021Nos. 20-37 and 20-38 are removed from the calendar for the March 2021 argument session. VIDED.
Apr 05 2021Upon consideration of the motion of petitioners to vacate the judgments of the court of appeals and remand, to remove the cases from the March 2021 argument calendar, and to hold further briefing in abeyance, these cases are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201-2605

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Charles Gresham, et al.
Other
Jaclyn Niccole Warr
    Counsel of Record
Stinson LLP
7700 Forsyth Blvd.
Suite 1100
Clayton, MO 63105

nicci.warr@stinson.com
3015242222
Party name: Nebraska Appleseed