No. 20-37
Vide 20-38
Title:Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charles Gresham, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5094, 19-5096)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Aug 14 2020Brief of respondent New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondents Charles Gresham, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 04 2020Reply of petitioners alex m. azar ii, secretary of health and human services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 04 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-38 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 04 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-37. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-37. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 29 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: alex m. azar ii, secretary of health and human services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Charles Gresham, et al.
Laura E. B. Lombardi
    Counsel of Record
New Hampshire Department of Justice
33 Capitol Street
Concord, NH 03301-6397

laura.lombardi@doj.nh.gov
6032713650
Party name: New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services