No. 20-363 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Frederick R. Whatley, Petitioner
v.
Warden, Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Prison
Docketed:September 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-12034)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2020Brief of respondents Warden, Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 4, 2020 to November 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 10, 2020 granted.
Nov 09 2020Reply of petitioner Frederick R. Whatley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 01 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 07 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 04 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 11 2021Rescheduled.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 19 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 16 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 22 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 01 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 15 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 23 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8406
Party name: Frederick R. Whatley
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
4046947975
Party name: Warden, Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center
Other
Buckner Potts Wellford
    Counsel of Record
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz
165 Madison Avenue, 20th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103

bwellford@bakerdonelson.com
9015262000
Party name: The National Association for Public Defense