No. 20-358 | |
Title: | Randy Henry, Petitioner v. J. Bret Johnson, et al. |
Docketed: | September 17, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-3298) |
Decision Date: | February 20, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 9, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 04 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 30 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent J. Bret Johnson, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 07 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020. |
Nov 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Eric Schnapper Counsel of Record | Univ. of Washington School of Law P.O. Box 353020 Seattle, WA 98195 schnapp@uw.edu | 206-660-8845 |
Party name: Randy Henry | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Julie Marie Blake Counsel of Record | Missouri Attorney General's Office 207 West High Street P.O. Box 899 Jefferson City, MO 65102 julie.blake@ago.mo.gov | 573-751-3321 |
Party name: J. Bret Johnson, et al. |