No. 20-356
Title:William P. Barr, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Jose Angel Banuelos-Galviz
Docketed:September 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-9517)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020)
Sep 17 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Nov 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 16 2020Response Requested. (Due December 16, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Robert Barr
    Counsel of Record
Lichter Immigration
1601 Vine Street
Denver, CO 80206

mbarr@lichterimmigration.com
303-554-8400
Party name: Jose Angel Banuelos-Galviz