No. 20-355
Title:Arctic Cat Inc., Petitioner
v.
Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1080)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Waiver of right of respondents Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Sep 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Lambeth Magnetic Structures, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1300 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: Arctic Cat Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Louis W. Tompros
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

louis.tompros@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6886
Party name: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al.
Other
Denise Marie De Mory
    Counsel of Record
Bunsow De Mory LLP
701 El Camino Real
Redwood City, CA 94063

ddemory@bdiplaw.com
650 351 7248
Party name: Lambeth Magnetic Structures, LLC