No. 20-351
Title:Norris Paul Carey, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Joanne Throwe, et al.
Docketed:September 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1194)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Waiver of right of respondents Joanne Throwe, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 19 2020Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2020)
Nov 18 2020Brief of respondents Deputy Secretary Joanne Throwe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2020Reply of Norris Paul Carey, Jr. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robin Ringgold Cockey
    Counsel of Record
Cockey, Brennan & Maloney, P.C.
313 Lemmon Hill Lane
Salisbury, MD 21801

rrcesq@cbmlawfirm.com
410-546-1750
Party name: Norris Paul Carey, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Doyle Bernhardt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7291
Party name: Deputy Secretary Joanne Throwe, et al.