No. 20-334
Title:City of San Antonio, Texas, On Behalf of Itself and All Other Similarly Situated Texas Municipalities, Petitioner
v.
Hotels.com, L.P., et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50701)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents Site59.com L.L.C. and Travelocity.com L.P. (n/k/a TVL LP) to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents Travelweb, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 29 2020Waiver of right of respondents Expedia, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 02 2020Response Requested. (Due December 2, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: City of San Antonio, Texas, on behalf of itself and all other similarly situated Texas municipalities
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas M. Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
One Market Street, Spear Tower
San Francisco, CA 94105

thomas.peterson@morganlewis.com
(415) 442-1000
Party name: Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Trip Network, Inc., Internetwork Publishing Corp., Travelnow.com, Inc.
Anne Marie SeibelBradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203

aseibel@bradley.com
205-521-8386
Party name: Travelweb, LLC, et al.
Brian S. StagnerKelly Hart & Hallman LLP
201 Main Street, Suite 2400
Fort Worth, TX 76102

brian.stagner@kellyhart.com
817-878-3567
Party name: Site59.com L.L.C. and Travelocity.com L.P. (n/k/a TVL LP)