No. 20-330
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, Petitioner
v.
Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-474)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
Certificate of Word CountPetition
Oct 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.
Oct 14 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Lawrence A. Hamermesh.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, et al.
Other
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Professor Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Robert W. Ray
    Counsel of Record
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
1211 Avenue of the Americas
40th Floor
New York, NY 10036

rray@zeklaw.com
2128265321
Party name: Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project