No. 20-327 | |
Title: | BBB Industries, LLC, Petitioner v. Cardone Industries, Inc. |
Docketed: | September 11, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Texas, Second District |
Case Numbers: | (02-18-00025-CV) |
Decision Date: | May 9, 2019 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | June 5, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 03 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 21 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Cardone Industries, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020. |
Oct 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Kelsi Brown Corkran Counsel of Record | Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP 1152 15th Street NW Washington, DC 20005 kcorkran@orrick.com | 202-339-8497 |
Party name: BBB Industries, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Richard Phillips Hogan Jr. Counsel of Record | Hogan & Hogan Pennzoil Place, South Tower 711 Louisiana St., Suite 500 Houston, TX 77002 rhogan@hoganfirm.com | 7132228800 |
Party name: Cardone Industries, Inc. |