No. 20-326
Title:Mitchell J. Stein, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-13762)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020.
Oct 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association for Public Defense, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

jlfisher@omm.com
(650) 473-2633
Party name: Mitchell J. Stein
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
202-626-5552
Party name: National Association for Public Defense, et al.