No. 20-322
Title:Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Esteban Aleman Gonzalez, et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16465)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.
Oct 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; time is extended to and including December 16, 2020.
Dec 16 2020Brief of respondents Esteban A. Gonzalez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Aug 23 2021Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether, under 8 U. S. C. ยง 1252(f)(1), the courts below had jurisdiction to grant classwide injunctive relief.
Sep 28 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 14, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 06 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 14 2021Brief of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 18 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Oct 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, January 11, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Nov 17 2021the record from the 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Nov 22 2021Brief of respondents Esteban A. Gonzalez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Brief amici curiae of Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, et al. filed (also in 19-896). VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Immigration Judges and Board of Immigration Appeals Members filed (also in 19-896). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed (also in 19-896). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021CIRCULATED
Dec 22 2021Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2022Argued. For petitioners: Curtis E. Gannon, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Matthew H. Adams, Seattle, Wash.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Hyrum Adams
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
615 Second Avenue
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98104

matt@nwirp.org
206-957-8611
Party name: Esteban A. Gonzalez, et al.
Ahilan T. ArulananthamACLU Foundation of Southern CA
1313 West 8th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017

aarulanantham@aclusocal.org
213-977-5211
Party name: Esteban A. Gonzalez, et al.
Michael Bryan KaufmanACLU Foundation of Southern California
1313 West Eighth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017

MKaufman@aclusocal.org
(213) 977-5232
Party name: Esteban A. Gonzalez, et al.
Other
Samir Ibrahim Deger-Sen
    Counsel of Record
Latham and Watkins LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

samir.deger-sen@lw.com
2129064619
Party name: Law Professors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, 63rd Floor
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Retired Federal Judges
Nancy Morawetz
    Counsel of Record
Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.
245 Sullivan street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10012

nancy.morawetz@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6430
Party name: Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, et al
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Former Immigration Judges and Board of Immigration Appeals Members