No. 20-319
Title:Comcast Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Viamedia, Inc.
Docketed:September 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2852)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Comcast Corporation, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020.
Oct 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Economics and Antitrust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of NCTA - The Internet & Television Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2020Brief of respondent Viamedia, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Reply of petitioners Comcast Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: Comcast Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: Viamedia, Inc.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Matthew A. Brill
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

matthew.brill@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: NCTA - The Internet & Television Association
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Scholars of Economics and Antitrust